Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a train or light engine used in connection with the movement of freight from being operated in the State unless it has at least two crew members; establishing certain penalties; providing a railroad company is solely responsible for the actions of its agents or employees in certain violations; prohibiting a county or municipal corporation from enacting and enforcing more stringent measures; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to provide certain notice to the Department of Legislative Services; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0381 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Saab) Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Floor Amendment {713823/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (37-84) 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (96-41) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {767578/1 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {767578/1 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-30) 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Floor Amendment {943926/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-28) 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Floor Amendment {683327/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (12-28) 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {767578/1 Adopted 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Serafini) Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (33-12) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (101-37) 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM