Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Afzali, Barve, Chang, Ebersole, Glass, Grammer, Hill, Hixson, Jameson, Kaiser, Krebs, Krimm, Luedtke, McDonough, A. Miller, Morhaim, Patterson, Stein, Waldstreicher, B. Wilson, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that prohibitions relating to the practice of veterinary medicine do not apply to emergency veterinary care for which a person may not be held civilly liable; providing immunity from civil liability for specified people providing emergency veterinary aid, care, or assistance to an animal where the owner or custodian is not available to grant permission under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0269
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {110014/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {198470/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-1)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {110014/1 Adopted 30
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 32
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 31
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {198470/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-1) 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Text - Chapter - Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-313, 2-314 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM