Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual to resume participation in the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection in the Employees' Pension System or Teachers' Pension System if the individual has been separated from employment and has accrued a certain amount of eligibility service; providing for the retroactive application of the Act; requiring certain service credit earned in the Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit to be credited to the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0153
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing canceled
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 37
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 37
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Text - Chapter - Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:32 AM