Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General - Technical Changes MC/PG 104-19
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Correcting certain references to the Office of the Inspector General in statutes of the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission; correcting certain erroneous references to the executive director of the Commission in certain provisions of law regarding certain action related to the failure of certain employees and officials to provide certain information to the Inspector General; providing that the Office shall review and approve certain costs for certain facilities designed and constructed by certain developers; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {310614/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General - Technical Changes MC/PG 104-19
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {310614/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General - Technical Changes MC/PG 104-19
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Text - Chapter - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General - Technical Changes MC/PG 104-19
(   17-608, 18-201, 25-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page