Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education Level
Sponsored by
Delegates Sydnor, D.E. Davis, Brooks, Charkoudian, Fennell, Queen, and Harrison
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Insurance Administration to study the role of occupation and educational level in policies of private passenger motor vehicle insurance; requiring the Administration to review certain matters as part of the study; and requiring the Administration to submit a final report on the study to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Economic Matters Committee by December 31, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0233
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0656 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703594/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education Level
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {703594/1 Adopted 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education Level
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM