Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Law Enforcement Officer - Misconduct In Office
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Delegates Glenn, McIntosh, and B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a law enforcement officer, while acting in the course of the officer's official duties, from committing a misdemeanor or felony that carries a maximum penalty of imprisonment of more than 1 year; providing a penalty for a violation of the Act; providing that a sentence imposed under the Act shall be consecutive to and not concurrent with any other sentence imposed for any crime based on the act establishing the violation; and defining a term.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-308 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:25 AM