Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Delegates Branch, Carter, Clippinger, Glenn, Hammen, Hayes, Haynes, Lierman, McCray, McIntosh, Oaks, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from $1,500,000 to $6,000,000, a specified statutory minimum grant to Baltimore City, payable from the State's share of the proceeds of Program Open Space, for specified purposes related to Program Open Space.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0631 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM