Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Joint Returns - Married Couples
Sponsored by
Delegates Barve, Anderson, Barnes, Bohanan, Bromwell, Cardin, Carter, Clagett, Clippinger, Costa, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Feldman, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Hammen, Haynes, Hixson, Hubbard, Ivey, Jones, Kach, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Lafferty, Lee, Luedtke, Malone, McHale, McIntosh, A. Miller, Mitchell, Mizeur, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Simmons, Summers, F. Turner, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, Zucker, and McMillan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a presumption, for the purpose of filing a Maryland income tax return, that a married couple who does not file a joint federal income tax return or married filing separate federal income tax return has filed a specified federal income tax return; authorizing specified married individuals who meet specified requirements to use the head of household filing status for a specified purpose; applying the Act, subject to specified provisions, to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2012; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {795065/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {235465/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {279930/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-5)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {795065/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {235465/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 51
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {279930/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 61
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (123-5) 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 10-807 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM