Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - Designee Appointments and Fiduciary Duties
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Veto sustained (0-135)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Budget and Management, the State Comptroller, and the State Treasurer to each appoint their respective deputies to serve as designees on the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System; and altering a specified defined term to provide for specified fiduciary duties of members of specified committees established by the Board.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0321
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-135)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {684162/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/17/2017 Veto sustained (0-135)
House 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 12:30 p.m.
House 3/04/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {684162/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 43
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 56
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Returned Passed 58A
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM