Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Sponsored by
Delegates Barkley and W. Miller
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Public Service Commission, when determining specified expenses while setting a just and reasonable rate for a gas company, to include all costs reasonably incurred by the gas company for performing environmental remediation of real property in response to a State or federal law, regulation, or order under specified conditions; authorizing that specified environmental remediation costs be included in a gas company's specified expenses regardless of specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0355
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {953928/1 (Delegate Morhaim) Rejected
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (81-55)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Floor Amendment {953928/1 (Delegate Morhaim) Rejected 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed 64
Text - Third - Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (81-55) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM