Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Grant Programs and Funding (Public Safety and Violence Prevention Act of 2018)
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Ali, Anderson, Barron, Brooks, Clippinger, Conaway, Ebersole, Frick, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Hettleman, Hill, C. Howard, R. Lewis, McCray, McIntosh, Morhaim, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Rosenberg, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Violence Intervention and Prevention Program Fund to support effective violence reduction strategies by providing competitive grants to local governments and nonprofit organizations to fund evidence-based health programs or evidence-informed health programs and to evaluate certain programs; authorizing the Governor to annually appropriate up to $10,000,000 to the Fund; establishing the Maryland Violence Intervention and Prevention Advisory Council; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0545
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604661/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {503324/1 (Delegate Lierman) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-5)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {419237/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-23)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Violence Intervention and Prevention Program Fund - Establishment
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {604661/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Floor Amendment {503324/1 (Delegate Lierman) Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Public Safety – Grant Programs and Funding (Public Safety and Violence Prevention Act of 2018)
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 46A
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (130-5) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {419237/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (116-23) 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety – Grant Programs and Funding (Public Safety and Violence Prevention Act of 2018)
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Text - Chapter - Public Safety – Grant Programs and Funding (Public Safety and Violence Prevention Act of 2018)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-801 through 4-806, 4-901 through 4-909 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM