Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – Conversion to Zero–Emission Buses (Zero–Emission Bus Transition Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Barve, Cain, Carr, Charkoudian, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Kaiser, Kelly, Lierman, Love, McIntosh, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Pendergrass, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Turner, Valderrama, C. Watson, Holmes, Terrasa
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, beginning in fiscal year 2022, the Maryland Transit Administration from purchasing buses for the Administration's State transit bus fleet that are not zero-emission buses; requiring the Administration, on or before January 1, 2021, and each January 1 thereafter, to submit a report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the implementation of the Act; requiring the report to include a schedule for converting to zero-emission buses and a plan for transitioning any adversely affected State employees; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0423
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {220919/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (112-22)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Electric Buses (Electric Bus Transition Act)
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {220919/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Maryland Transit Administration – Conversion to Zero–Emission Buses (Zero–Emission Bus Transition Act)
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (112-22) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 50
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/19/2020 9:46 AM