Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders - Coverage
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Arikan, Bagnall, Buckel, Chang, C. Watson, K. Young, Barron, Belcastro, Bhandari, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, and Szeliga
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, beginning January 1, 2021, to provide services for pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections and pediatric acute onset neuropsychiatric syndrome under certain circumstances; requiring carriers to provide coverage for certain diagnosis, evaluation, and treatment of pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders; applying the Act to all policies, contracts and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0475
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {576687/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {447372/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed 45-0
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders - Coverage
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {576687/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders - Coverage
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Finance 51
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {447372/1 Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed 45-0 53C
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   15-855 )
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:15 PM