Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth and Shortage
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Bagnall, Bhandari, Charles, Cullison, Kelly, Kerr, R. Lewis, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing certain health care practitioners to establish a practitioner-patient relationship through telehealth interactions; requiring a health care practitioner providing telehealth services to be held to the same standards of practice that are applicable to in-person settings and, if clinically appropriate, provide or refer a patient for in-patient services or another type of telehealth service; prohibiting a health care practitioner from prescribing a certain opiate through telehealth except under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0402
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Care Practitioners - Telehealth
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {956186/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Care Practitioners - Telehealth
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-6)
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184632/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {383622/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {983426/2 (Senator McCray) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-2)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth and Shortage
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Care Practitioners - Telehealth
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {956186/1 Adopted 41
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Health Care Practitioners - Telehealth
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-6) 42A
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {184632/1 Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Floor Amendment {383622/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Floor Amendment {983426/2 (Senator McCray) Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-2) 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth and Shortage
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-1001 through 1-1006 )
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:32 AM