Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Wearable Computer With Head-Mounted Display - Prohibited
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Barkley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glass, A. Miller, and S. Robinson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from operating a motor vehicle on a highway while wearing or using a wearable computer with a head-mounted display; and defining the term "wearable computer with a head-mounted display" as a computer device that is worn on an individual's head, and projects visual information into the field of vision of the individual wearing the device.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0604 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-29)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Second Reading Passed 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (110-29) 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1130, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM