Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Buckel, Cullison, Ebersole, Hornberger, Krebs, Mosby, Rose, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Brewery Promotion Program in the Department of Commerce to provide grants and to conduct certain activities to promote the creation and development of Maryland breweries, visits to Maryland breweries, and the production and consumption of Maryland beer; requiring an applicant to meet certain requirements to qualify for participation in the Program; establishing the Maryland Brewery Promotion Fund to provide certain grants; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0508
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1370 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1701 through 5-1705 )
(   2-301, 5-105 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:23 AM