Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Afzali, Aumann, Beitzel, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, W. Miller, Morgan, and Reilly
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring individuals who apply to register to vote after June 30, 2017, to submit proof of United States citizenship; providing that individuals who are not citizens of the United States are not qualified to be registered voters; requiring an applicant for voter registration to submit specified documents or information to prove United States citizenship; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1390 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-102, 3-103, 3-202, 3-501, 9-305 )
Last Updated: 11/13/2019 12:52 PM