Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer Notifications
Sponsored by
Delegates Serafini, Afzali, Aumann, Beitzel, Fisher, Frank, George, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Krebs, McComas, W. Miller, Myers, Norman, O'Donnell, Schuh, Schulz, Smigiel, Stifler, Stocksdale, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified supervising authority operating a facility having custody of or providing residential or nonresidential reentry services to a registered sex offender to provide notice of a transfer of the registrant to a facility in another county to the local law enforcement unit in the county of the new facility and the Division of Parole and Probation within a specified period.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0491
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-701, 11-708 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM