Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer – Eligibility (Firefighter Jesse McCullough’s Cancer Protection Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates D.E. Davis, D. Barnes, Charles, Fennell, W. Fisher, Gaines, Harrison, Ivey, Proctor, Turner, Walker, and R. Watson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which firefighters, fire fighting instructors, rescue squad members, advanced life support unit members, and members of the Office of the State Fire Marshal are presumed to be suffering from an occupational disease that was suffered in the line of duty and is compensable under the workers' compensation law to encompass individuals with at least 10 years of cumulative service within the State and the cancer or leukemia has resulted in partial or total disability or death; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0646
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {863698/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-3)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {467773/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {643129/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-4)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer - Eligibility
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {863698/1 Adopted 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer - Eligibility
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (131-3) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments {467773/1 Adopted 51
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Floor Amendment {643129/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0) 52
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 54
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (131-4) 54
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Workers’ Compensation – Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer – Eligibility (Firefighter Jesse McCullough’s Cancer Protection Law)
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Text - Chapter - Workers’ Compensation – Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer – Eligibility (Firefighter Jesse McCullough’s Cancer Protection Law)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:40 PM