Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Angel, Barkley, Barve, Clippinger, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Hayes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, C. Howard, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McCray, Moon, Morales, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, Robinson, Sanchez, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Tarlau, Ali, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that a student's absence from school due to the student's pregnancy or parenting needs is a lawful absence; requiring each county board of education to develop a written attendance policy for pregnant and parenting students that, at a minimum, excuses specified absences under specified circumstances and provides at least 10 days of excused absences after the birth of a parenting student's child; requiring each county board to publish its written attendance policy for pregnant and parenting students on the Board's Web site; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0232
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {465466/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Aumann) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {843526/1 (Delegate Aumann) Rejected (52-85)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-13)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {444532/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Recede (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {465466/1 Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Aumann) Adopted 40
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {843526/1 (Delegate Aumann) Rejected (52-85) 41
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (125-13) 43
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {444532/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Recede (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Recede 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (36-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
Text - Chapter - Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-301.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM