Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mechanical Repair Contracts - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Jameson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "service contract" to include a specified mechanical repair contract; altering the definition of "mechanical repair contract" and defining "obligor" for purposes of specified provisions of law establishing requirements for mechanical repair contracts and persons who sell or offer them; authorizing the Insurance Commissioner to investigate and determine if a mechanical repair contract is in compliance with specified provisions of law; establishing specified required disclosures; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {103291/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {897773/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {103291/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 51
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Finance 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {897773/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-401, 14-409 )
(   2-112 )
(   15-311.2, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM