Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Apprenticeship and Training Council - Annual Report
Sponsored by
Delegates McCray, Anderson, Barkley, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Glenn, Healey, Lierman, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Platt, Sydnor, Tarlau, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Apprenticeship and Training Council to report to the General Assembly, on or before June 30 of each year, specified information regarding each apprenticeship program registered in the State and the individuals enrolled in those programs; and requiring the Council to sort the information in a specified manner and publish the report on the Council's Web site.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-2)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Salling) Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 50
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed 50
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-2) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Finance 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Salling) Adopted 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (33-0) 65
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM