Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Standards - Deductibles
Sponsored by
Delegate Jameson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that an insurer that issues a policy of homeowner's insurance file with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner for approval a specified underwriting standard that requires a specified deductible under specified circumstances before the insurer may implement the underwriting standard; requiring an insurer to file for information with the Commissioner a specified underwriting standard at least a specified period of time before the insurer proposes to implement the underwriting standard; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
(   19-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page