Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Trade in Ivory and Rhinoceros Horn - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Atterbeary, Carr, Cassilly, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Kelly, Korman, Lafferty, Lam, Moon, Pendergrass, Reznik, S. Robinson, Stein, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from purchasing, selling, offering for sale, possessing with the intent to sell, or importing with the intent to sell any ivory or rhinoceros horn, subject to specified exceptions; establishing under specified circumstances a presumption that a person possesses ivory or rhinoceros horn with the intent to sell; establishing specified penalties for a violation of the Act; authorizing a court to order that a person who violates the Act pay specified restitution to be used for specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-2A-06.1, 10-2A-08.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM