Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsored by
The Speaker and Delegates Hixson, F. Turner, Beidle, Bohanan, Branch, Bromwell, Cane, Cardin, Clagett, Clippinger, Conway, Davis, DeBoy, Dumais, Frick, Gaines, Gilchrist, Griffith, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Hammen, Haynes, Healey, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Ivey, James, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Lafferty, Lee, Malone, McHale, McIntosh, A. Miller, Mitchell, Murphy, Olszewski, Pendergrass, B. Robinson, Rudolph, Simmons, Stein, Stukes, Tarrant, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Walker, Wilson, Zucker, Serafini, Afzali, Arentz, Aumann, Barve, Bates, Beitzel, Cluster, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, Frank, George, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Hough, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, Myers, Norman, Otto, Parrott, Ready, Schuh, Schulz, Stocksdale, and Szeliga
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the size of an estate required to file an estate tax return; altering a certain limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax; repealing a specified limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying before January 1, 2019; and altering a specified limit on the amount of the Maryland estate tax.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0602
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments {335969/1 Report Adopted 42
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (119-14) 43
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 41A
Senate 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/18/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 49
House 3/21/2014 3/18/2014 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM