Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Bohanan, Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Branch, Braveboy, Bromwell, Busch, Cane, Carter, Clagett, Conway, Cullison, Davis, DeBoy, Donoghue, Dumais, Frick, Gaines, Griffith, Guzzone, Hammen, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Hubbard, James, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Lafferty, Luedtke, Malone, McHale, McIntosh, A. Miller, Murphy, Oaks, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, B. Robinson, Rudolph, Sophocleus, Stein, Tarrant, F. Turner, V. Turner, Vallario, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Weir, Wilson, Wood, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program; establishing a Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund and a Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority in the Department of Business and Economic Development; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill specified appropriations to the Fund for specified fiscal years; providing for the membership and duties of the Authority; providing for the duties of the Department in connection with the Program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0601
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {725362/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (103-31) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 65
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM