Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection and Uninsured Motorist Coverages - Limitation
Sponsored by
Delegate Jameson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a motor vehicle liability insurance policy may provide that, in a specified action for uninsured or underinsured motorist coverage arising out of the same accident or occurrence as a specified action for personal injury protection, a specified insurer may offset specified payments received for personal injury protection for specified damages; providing that a specified motor vehicle liability insurance policy may provide that specified benefits may be offset under specified coverage for specified elements; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0803
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
(   19-509.1, 19-513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page