Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Itemized Deductions
Sponsored by
Delegates Wivell, Buckel, Arikan, Corderman, Hartman, Hornberger, Kipke, Krebs, Malone, McComas, and Saab
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual to itemize deductions to compute Maryland taxable income whether or not the individual itemizes deductions on the individual's federal income tax return; providing that, for an individual who does not itemize deductions on the individual's federal income tax return, Maryland itemized deductions shall be determined as if an individual itemized deductions on the federal income tax return; and applying the Act to taxable years after December 31, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0486
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0327 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Itemized Deductions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Itemized Deductions
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-217, 10-218 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:06 PM