Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Business and Economic Development)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for specified cybersecurity companies under specified circumstances; providing for specified applications to the Department of Business and Economic Development for approval and certification of specified credits; providing for the issuance of specified initial credit certificates by the Department, subject to specified requirements and limitations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {195064/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-21)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {369135/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Delegates Frick, Serafini, and A. Washington
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Senators Manno, Brinkley, and Currie
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-4)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {195064/1 Report Adopted 53
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (115-21) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 52
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {369135/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 House Requests Senate Recede 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Delegates Frick, Serafini, and A. Washington 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Senate Refuses to Recede 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Senators Manno, Brinkley, and Currie 67
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (133-4) 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 68
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-733 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM