Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Business And Economic Development, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0751
Title
Income Tax Credit - Maryland Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 /CH0390
Title
Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 /CH0175
Title
Business and Economic Development - Enterprise Fund and Invest Maryland Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183 /CH0028
Title
Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0751 Income Tax Credit - Maryland Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0803 /CH0390 Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
SB0070 /CH0175 Business and Economic Development - Enterprise Fund and Invest Maryland Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0183 /CH0028 Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 28
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM