Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Insurance Laws That Apply to Health Maintenance Organizations - Consolidation and Clarification
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Consolidating the insurance laws of the State that apply to health maintenance organizations; clarifying the application of the insurance laws of the State to health maintenance organizations; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0893
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 12:30 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 48
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 47
Senate 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/01/2014 4/01/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-118, 15-1501, 15-401 through 15-403.1, 15-803, 15-818, 15-823, 15-903, 2-112, 27-209, 27-302 through 27-304, 27-305, 27-504, 27-606, 5-608 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM