Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at Retail
Sponsored by
Delegates Arora, Afzali, Anderson, Arentz, Aumann, Barnes, Barve, Bates, Beidle, Beitzel, Boteler, Branch, Braveboy, Burns, Cardin, Carr, Carter, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Cullison, Dumais, Dwyer, Elliott, Frank, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, George, Gilchrist, Glass, Guzzone, Haddaway-Riccio, Harper, Hixson, Hogan, Holmes, Hough, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Impallaria, Ivey, Jacobs, Kach, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kipke, Kramer, Krebs, Lee, Love, Luedtke, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McMillan, A. Miller, Minnick, Mizeur, Morhaim, Myers, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Norman, O'Donnell, Oaks, Otto, Parrott, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Ready, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Schulz, Serafini, Simmons, Smigiel, Stein, Stocksdale, Stukes, Summers, Szeliga, Tarrant, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vaughn, Vitale, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilson, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a limited kosher wine seller's permit; requiring an applicant for the permit to meet specified qualifications; authorizing a limited kosher wine seller to sell kosher wine to a consumer by receiving and filling orders that the consumer transmits by electronic or other means; specifying the term of a permit; requiring a limited kosher wine seller to file an annual tax return; limiting the amount of kosher wine that a limited kosher wine seller may sell during each year; imposing a specified fee; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0287
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0590 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2014 3/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-301, 14-202, 15-204, 7.7-101 through 7.7-116 )
(   13-825, 5-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM