Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, Morhaim, Anderson, Arora, Barve, Bobo, Boteler, Branch, Braveboy, Cane, Cardin, Carr, Carter, Clagett, Cullison, Donoghue, Dumais, Dwyer, Elliott, Frank, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glass, Guzzone, Haynes, Hixson, Hogan, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Kach, A. Kelly, Lafferty, McIntosh, McMillan, A. Miller, Minnick, Mizeur, Murphy, Niemann, Oaks, Ready, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Smigiel, Stein, Swain, Tarrant, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, Weir, Zucker, Hammen, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Costa, Kipke, Nathan-Pulliam, Pena-Melnyk, Barnes, Beidle, DeBoy, Frush, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Harper, Howard, Kaiser, Kramer, McConkey, Mitchell, Simmons, Stukes, Summers, Vaughn, A. Washington, and Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the purpose of the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission to include approval of physicians, development of a Web site, establishment of an application review process, and issuance of medical marijuana grower licenses; authorizing a medical marijuana grower to distribute marijuana at specified facilities; identifying patients and caregivers; requiring the Commission to report to the General Assembly on the level of competition in the market for medical marijuana on or before December 1, 2015; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0923
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {486688/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Schulz) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Schulz) {613127/1 Rejected (33-82)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-10)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {528178/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Delegates Morhaim, Hammen, and Kach
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senators Raskin, Brochin, and Shank
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-11)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {486688/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Special Order until later today (Delegate Schulz) Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Schulz) {613127/1 Rejected (33-82) 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (126-10) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {528178/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 House Requests Senate Recede 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Delegates Morhaim, Hammen, and Kach 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senate Refuses to Recede 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senators Raskin, Brochin, and Shank 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (125-11) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 64
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3301 through 13-3303, 13-3304 through 13-3306, 13-3307, 13-3307 through 13-3311, 13-3310, 13-3311, 13-3312, 13-3316 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM