Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Handgun Permits - Firearms Training Courses
Sponsored by
Delegates Saab, Anderton, Beidle, Beitzel, Bromwell, Buckel, Carey, Chang, Clark, Glass, Hornberger, S. Howard, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Lisanti, Malone, McComas, McConkey, McKay, Miele, W. Miller, Morgan, Oaks, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rose, Simonaire, Sophocleus, Szeliga, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Vallario)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirements from a minimum of 16 hours to 6 hours of instruction by a qualified handgun instructor for firearms training courses that an initial applicant for a permit to carry, wear, or transport a handgun must successfully complete; reducing from 8 to 2 the number of hours of instruction an applicant for renewal of a permit must successfully complete.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Handgun Permits - Firearms Training Courses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Lafferty) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Handgun Permits - Firearms Training Courses
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Adopted 48
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Lafferty) Adopted 48
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 50
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:41 PM