Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Carey and Lisanti
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a specified business, when destroying an employee's or a former employee's records containing specified personal information of the employee or former employee, to take specified steps to protect against unauthorized access to or use of the information; altering the circumstances under which a specified business must conduct an investigation and notify specified persons of a specified breach; authorizing a specified business to provide a specified required notice in a specified manner under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0525
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443190/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {657078/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {443190/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {657078/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Text - Chapter - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
(   14-3501, 14-3502, 14-3503, 14-3504, 14-3505, 14-3506, 14-3507, 14-3508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page