Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Weapon Crimes – Detachable Magazines and Regulated Firearms – Possession
Sponsored by
Baltimore City Delegation (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from possessing a certain detachable magazine that has a capacity of more than 10 rounds of ammunition; prohibiting a person from possessing a regulated firearm if the person was previously convicted of a certain crime involving possessing, owning, carrying, or transporting a firearm after having been convicted of a certain other crime; and applying certain penalties.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1062
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Weapon Crimes – Detachable Magazines and Regulated Firearms – Possession
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-622 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM