Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Barkley, Barve, Bates, Boteler, Cardin, Cluster, Costa, Cullison, Eckardt, Frank, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Hucker, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kach, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kipke, Lafferty, Luedtke, McComas, McConkey, W. Miller, Morhaim, Myers, Olszewski, Otto, Pendergrass, Ready, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Serafini, Simmons, Stein, Stocksdale, Szeliga, Valderrama, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, Weir, Wood, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Stating specified findings of the General Assembly; declaring a specified policy of the State; prohibiting specified institutions of higher education from using funds for specified purposes; and requiring a specified reduction to State funds under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0647
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM