Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Afzali, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Fisher, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Otto, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Vogt, West, and Ciliberti
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an election judge to establish a voter's identity and verify the voter's address if the voter seeks to vote a regular ballot; requiring an election judge to qualify a voter by requesting the voter to present a current government-issued photo identification; requiring an election judge to authorize an individual to vote a regular ballot; allowing a voter who is unable to present a specified form of identification to vote by provisional ballot under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0288 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
(   10-310, 16-201 )
(   12-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page