Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Family Investment Program – Work Activity Requirement – Authorized Activities and Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Lierman, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Services to allow an applicant for or recipient of assistance under the Family Investment Program to meet a work activity requirement by participating in vocational education for a minimum of 20 hours per week that leads to an associate degree, a diploma, or a certificate, or 20 hours per week of education directly related to employment; requiring the Department to report certain information to the General Assembly by October 1 of each year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0969
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Family Investment Program - Transitional Assistance for Education Pilot Program
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {464564/1 Adopted 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Family Investment Program – Work Activity Requirement – Authorized Activities and Report
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {347375/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Family Investment Program – Work Activity Requirement – Authorized Activities and Report
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Text - Chapter - Family Investment Program – Work Activity Requirement – Authorized Activities and Report
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-308, 5-322 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:34 AM