Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Condominium Act - Implied Warranties From Developers - Common Amenities
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the common amenities, to include pools, tennis and basketball courts, community centers, and other common amenities of a condominium be covered under an implied warranty on common elements from a developer to a council of unit owners.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Condominium Act - Implied Warranties From Developers - Common Amenities
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Condominium Act - Implied Warranties From Developers - Common Amenities
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46 Click to view Recorded Media
(   11-131 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:18 PM
Click to return on the top page