Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
Sponsored by
Delegates Pendergrass, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Beidle, Branch, Bromwell, Brooks, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Stein, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, C. Wilson, K. Young, and Mosby
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Family Planning Program in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to ensure the continuity of family planning services in the State; requiring the Program to provide family planning services to specified individuals through specified providers; authorizing the Department to adopt specified regulations; requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to ensure access to and continuity of services provided by specified family planning providers in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1081
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {856381/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {683224/1 (Delegate Simonaire) Rejected (47-89)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-51)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {833927/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {263322/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (14-32)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {663825/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {423027/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (14-31)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {713928/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {493721/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-32)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {856381/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Floor Amendment {683224/1 (Delegate Simonaire) Rejected (47-89) 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (90-51) 47
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable 51
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Hough) Adopted 51
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Adopted 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Floor Amendment {833927/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-30) 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Floor Amendment {263322/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (14-32) 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Floor Amendment {663825/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (15-31) 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Floor Amendment {423027/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (14-31) 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Floor Amendment {713928/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (15-31) 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Amendment {493721/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-32) 53
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 53
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Text - Chapter - Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3401, 13-3402, 15-101, 15-102.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM