Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Community School Strategy - Required Notice and Support
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Washington, Barron, Carter, Conaway, Glenn, Hixson, Jackson, Kaiser, Kelly, Lierman, Luedtke, Moon, Platt, Sydnor, Tarlau, Walker, P. Young, Ebersole, Fennell, Hornberger, Patterson, and A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to notify each local school system and each community school in the State that federal Title I funds may be used for expenses associated with community school coordinators and for the coordination of school and community resources under specified circumstances; requiring the Department to encourage specified school systems and schools in the State to apply for specified federal funding; requiring the Department to provide technical assistance to schools in applying for federal funding; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {785060/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-2)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {785060/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-2) 60
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 58
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM