Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Main Street Employer Tax Rebate
Sponsored by
Delegates Mizeur, Gutierrez, A. Kelly, Lafferty, Lee, Luedtke, Norman, Sophocleus, and Wood
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified corporations to compute Maryland taxable income using a specified method; requiring that, subject to specified regulations, specified groups of corporations file a combined income tax return; establishing the Small Business Personal Property Tax Rebate Program to provide personal property tax rebates to businesses with fewer than 25 employees; establishing the Small Business Personal Property Tax Rebate Fund; providing for the purposes of the Fund; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after Dec. 31, 2012; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-402.1, 10-811, 2-613.1, 2-614, 2-615 )
(   2-301, 2-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM