Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Forest Conservation Act - Net Tract Area PG/MC 114-16
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the defined term "net tract area" as it applies in Prince George's County to afforestation and reforestation requirements under the Forest Conservation Act to include, under specified circumstances, existing forested land that is located in a 100-year floodplain.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1601, 5-1606 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM