Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Saab, Aumann, Cluster, S. Howard, Jacobs, Krebs, Malone, McComas, McConkey, W. Miller, Morgan, and Simonaire
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an employee of a public body from creating or maintaining government e-mail by using a personal e-mail account; requiring an employee of a public body, under specified circumstances, to forward government e-mail to the official e-mail account of the employee within 5 days after the government e-mail is received; requiring each public body to retain government e-mail for at least 1 year; requiring the State Archivist to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0492 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - Requirements
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4.5-101 through 4.5-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM