Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Collective Bargaining - Technical Unit MC/PG 114-19
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a separate technical collective bargaining unit within the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission in which employees have a combination of basic scientific or technical knowledge and manual skill that is usually acquired through specialized postsecondary school education or through equivalent on-the-job training; altering a provision of law that had established a certain joint office/technical collective bargaining unit to establish a separate office collective bargaining unit; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184968/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-17)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Collective Bargaining - Technical Unit MC/PG 114-19
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {184968/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Collective Bargaining - Technical Unit MC/PG 114-19
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (116-17) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/22/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Text - Chapter - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Collective Bargaining - Technical Unit MC/PG 114-19
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page