Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Entrance-Level and Annual Training Requirements (Christopher's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Braveboy, Carr, Dwyer, Glenn, Oaks, B. Robinson, and F. Turner
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering entrance-level and annual training conducted by the State and each county and municipal police training school that are required by the Police Training Commission to include specified training consistent with specified provisions.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-21)
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed 52
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (110-21) 53A
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM