Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim and Lam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling or offering to sell alcoholic beverages that are sold in a powder or crystalline form for direct use or use in combination with water or any other substance; providing that a person who violates the Act is guilty of a misdemeanor and on conviction is subject to a fine of up to $1,000; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted (134-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-19)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted (134-0) 47
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 47
House 3/25/2015 3/26/2015 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Third Reading Passed (121-19) 62
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 59
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/14/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/14/2015 4/10/2015 Second Reading Passed 68
Senate 4/14/2015 4/10/2015 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 68
Senate 4/14/2015 4/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 68
House 4/14/2015 4/11/2015 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-102, 16-505.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM