Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Oil and Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Robinson, Barve, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Beidle, Branch, Bromwell, Brooks, Carr, Chang, Conaway, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Frush, Gutierrez, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, Jackson, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Knotts, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Queen, Reznik, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Stein, Turner, Valderrama, Vallario, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, Mosby, and Gilchrist
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from engaging in the hydraulic fracturing of a well for the exploration or production of oil or natural gas in the State; repealing a provision of law that requires the Department of the Environment to adopt specified regulations; and repealing a provision of law that prohibits the Department from issuing a specified permit until October 1, 2017.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0740
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Oil and Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {200614/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate McKay) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {433428/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (41-90)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {583222/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (44-86)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Oil and Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-40)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted (35-12)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {123923/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Oil and Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Oil and Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {200614/1 Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate McKay) Adopted 40
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {433428/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (41-90) 41
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {583222/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (44-86) 41
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Oil and Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted 43
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (97-40) 43
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable 50
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 50
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted (35-12) 51
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Floor Amendment {123923/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 52
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Text - Chapter - Oil and Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-107.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM