Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Student Peer Mediation Program Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Chang, Corderman, Jackson, and McKay
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Student Peer Mediation Program Fund to provide grant assistance to schools and community-based organizations in Baltimore City to establish student peer mediation programs to reduce juvenile violence; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Fund; requiring the Governor to appropriate at least $50,000 for the Fund annually; requiring the Executive Director to establish grant application procedures for schools and community-based organizations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1731 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Public Safety - Student Peer Mediation Program Fund - Establishment
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {134169/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Public Safety - Student Peer Mediation Program Fund - Establishment
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 47A
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments {879737/1 Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - Student Peer Mediation Program Fund - Establishment
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Student Peer Mediation Program Fund - Establishment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-1201 through 4-1203 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:35 AM